DC B24-0290 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0152 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008000, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Act A24-0152 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008000, Expires on Nov 03, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposed Annual-Year Contract No. PO631447 with OverDrive, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Proposed Annual-Year Contract No. PO631447 with OverDrive, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-07-13 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Council | Act A24-0152 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008000, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0152, Expires on Nov 03, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 6, 2021 |
2021-07-13 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-06-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |