DC B24-0256 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0175, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011945
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Law L24-0175, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011945
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-256 would clarify that conflicts of interest in the workplace would not violate District restriction on the use of non-compete provisions. It also clarifies that employers may also bar an employee’s use of sensitive information during or after employment.
Title
Non-Compete Conflict of Interest Clarification Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Council - Amendment (Pinto) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Council | Law L24-0175, Effective from Sep 21, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 011945 |
2022-08-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-08-05 | Council | Act A24-0526 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 009910 |
2022-07-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-07-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0526 |
2022-07-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 4, 2022 |
2022-07-12 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2022-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | First Reading |
2022-06-28 | Council | Amendment (Pinto) |
2022-06-28 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) - Not Considered |
2022-06-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-06-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0256 |
2022-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-06-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-07-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-06-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-06-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-05-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0256 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |