DC B24-0203 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Act A24-0720 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-13 - Act A24-0720 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-203 clarifies that the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner (OCME) case files are confidential, in line with the privacy protections provided for death certificates and medical records. It also clarifies access to OCME case files by government entities that need the information to carry out their functions.
RACIAL EQUITY ANALYSIS NOTE - The bill’s provision allowing for OCME to transfer property to a person with the right to control the disposition of the decedent’s remains will have an inconclusive impact on District residents. Making external examination and autopsy reports public records under FOIA, while limiting who can access images and photos of the decedent will likely improve mental well-being, health, access to information, and privacy for Black District residents. The exceptions in Bill 24-0203 for OCME to release images for medical or scientific education or research will negatively affect Black District residents’ agency in medical and scientific settings. Please see REIA for more information.
Title
Medical Examiner Records Privacy Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-13 | Council | Act A24-0720 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 000232 |
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2023-01-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0720 |
2022-12-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 4, 2023 |
2022-12-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-15 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0203 |
2022-11-02 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2021-05-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-04-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0203 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |