DC B24-0195 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Law L24-0013, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008595, Expires on Mar 10, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Law L24-0013, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008595, Expires on Mar 10, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Cannabis Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Title
Medical Cannabis Temporary Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Council | Law L24-0013, Effective from Jul 28, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008595, Expires on Mar 10, 2022 |
2021-06-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2021-06-04 | Council | Act A24-0088 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 005834 |
2021-05-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-25 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0088 |
2021-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-04-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0195 Published in the DC Register |
2021-04-06 | Council | First Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-04-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |