DC B24-0177 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0059 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004817, Expires on Aug 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Act A24-0059 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004817, Expires on Aug 01, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCCB-2020-F-0029 with Hausfeld, LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Contract No. DCCB-2020-F-0029 with Hausfeld, LLP Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Council | Act A24-0059 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 004817, Expires on Aug 01, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-05-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0059, Expires on Aug 01, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 4, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-04-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-03-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |