DC B23-1008 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0594 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0594 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Reverse Mortgage Insurance and Tax Payment Program Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0594 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001188 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0594 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-1008 Published in the DC Register |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |