DC B23-0886 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0586 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0586 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-886 prohibits the use of enforcement quotas for the Metro Transit Police Department and creates a multijurisdictional Civilian Complaint Board to review complaints against Metro Transit Police Department members. The Board shall have the authority to dismiss, conciliate, mediate, investigate, adjudicate, or refer for further action.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Police Accountability Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0586 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001145 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0586 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-12-01 | Council | Postponed to 12/15/20 |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0886 |
2020-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0886 Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |