DC B23-0859 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RPP Voluntarily Exclusion Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RPP Voluntarily Exclusion Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-08-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-08-19CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-07-31CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0859 Published in the DC Register
2020-07-28CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-07-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback