DC B23-0825 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Act A23-0336 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9148, Expires on Oct 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Act A23-0336 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9148, Expires on Oct 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Second Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - Amendment (Grosso #2) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - Council - Amendment (Grosso #2) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Council | Act A23-0336 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9148, Expires on Oct 19, 2020 |
2020-07-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-07-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0336, Expires on Oct 19, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-07-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2020 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Grosso #2) |
2020-07-07 | Council | Amendment (Grosso #1) - Not Considered |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |