DC B23-0794 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Act A23-0363 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9675, Expires on Nov 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Act A23-0363 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9675, Expires on Nov 07, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFP-0062 with Smoot Construction Company of Washington, DC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFP-0062 with Smoot Construction Company of Washington, DC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-14 | Council | Act A23-0363 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9675, Expires on Nov 07, 2020 |
2020-08-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0363, Expires on Nov 07, 2020 |
2020-07-27 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 10, 2020 |
2020-07-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |