DC B23-0775 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Policing and Justice Reform Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - Council - Postponed Indefinitely (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendment (Grosso #1) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendment (Grosso #2) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendments (Mendelson & Grosso) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07CouncilPostponed Indefinitely
2020-06-30CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-06-12CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0775 Published in the DC Register
2020-06-09CouncilAmendment (Grosso #1)
2020-06-09CouncilAmendment (Grosso #2)
2020-06-09CouncilAmendments (Mendelson)
2020-06-09CouncilFirst Reading
2020-06-08CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback