DC B23-0684 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0106, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8047, Expires on Jan 28, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0106, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8047, Expires on Jan 28, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Leave to Vote Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Leave to Vote Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-03 | Council | Law L23-0106, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8047, Expires on Jan 28, 2021 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-04-10 | Council | Act A23-0277 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3948 |
2020-04-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-31 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0277 |
2020-03-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 3, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0684 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |