DC B23-0624 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-624 allows for Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge (CRIAC) funds to be applied to accounts in arrears for the purposes of reconnection to be eligible for the CRIAC relief program thus providing relief from water utility bills for residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impervious Area Charge Water Utility Consumer Protection Fund Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-03-06CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2020-01-31CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0624 Published in the DC Register
2020-01-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback