DC B23-0606 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Act A23-0472 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-606 requires the District of Columbia Retirement Board to report annually on the affirmative steps it has taken to hire diverse fund managers including minorities, women, and disabled individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diversity in Fund Management Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-13CouncilAct A23-0472 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13258
2020-11-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-11-03CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-11-02CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0472
2020-10-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020
2020-10-06CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-09-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-09-22CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-09-22CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0606
2020-02-27CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0606 Published in the DC Register
2020-01-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2020-01-07CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback