DC B23-0588 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Act A23-0205 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 753, Expires on Apr 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Act A23-0205 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 753, Expires on Apr 26, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. DCRL-2016-C-0004 with Far Southeast Family Strengthening Collaborative Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modifications to Contract No. DCRL-2016-C-0004 with Far Southeast Family Strengthening Collaborative Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Council | Act A23-0205 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 753, Expires on Apr 26, 2020 |
2020-01-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0205, Expires on Apr 26, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-12-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |