DC B23-0569 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-569 establishes reporting requirements and limitations on soliciting and allocating funds for fundraising by family or school community organizations, including parent teacher organizations, parent teacher student organizations, and home school associations. It also establishes guidelines for redistributing funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Public Schools Family And School Community Fundraising Equity Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-06CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0569 Published in the DC Register
2019-12-03CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-12-03CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback