DC B23-0531 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0091, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-91 amends the comparators that determine what is competitive compensation in collective bargaining negotiations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining Fair Compare Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15CouncilLaw L23-0091, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5012
2020-03-27CouncilAct A23-0265 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3541
2020-03-25CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-03-24CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0265
2020-03-18CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-03-09CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020
2020-03-03CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-02-04CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-01-29CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0531
2019-12-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0531 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback