DC B23-0530 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-530 sets income eligibility standards for renting a rent stabilized apartment. A unit covered under the Rent Stabilization Program shall only be rented to a tenant with a monthly adjusted gross income less than 5 times the monthly rent charged for the unit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rent Stabilization Affordability Qualification Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-08-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-08-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-03-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-02-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0530 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-11-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback