DC B23-0503 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Law L23-0048, Effective from Jan 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1692, Expires on Sep 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Law L23-0048, Effective from Jan 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1692, Expires on Sep 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Council | Law L23-0048, Effective from Jan 28, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1692, Expires on Sep 09, 2020 |
2019-12-13 | Council | Act A23-0175 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 16179 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-12-05 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0175 |
2019-11-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-11-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2019 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-11-05 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0503 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |