DC B23-0440 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0561 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000769
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0561 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000769
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Chairman is referring this legislation sequentially to the Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and the Committee of the Whole (section 3) and then to the Committee of the Whole with comments from the Committee on Facilities and Procurement.
As introduced Bill 23-440 establishes a uniform standard for occupational licensing boards to consider only pending criminal accusations or prior convictions directly related to the occupation for which the license is sought. Adverse decisions must be subject to mitigating evidence submitted by the applicant. The Mayor and the Deputy Mayor for Public Safety and Justice are required to submit reports to the Council involving adverse decisions and their collateral consequences.
Title
Removing Barriers to Occupational Licensing for Returning Citizens Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Act A23-0561 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000769 |
2021-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0561 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0440 |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0440 |
2020-01-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-01-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0440 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |