DC B23-0232 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0156, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000730
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0156, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000730
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes an Autonomous Vehicles Testing Program to be administered by the District Department of Transportation.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement.
Title
Autonomous Vehicles Testing Program Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0156, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000730 |
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0450 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13048 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0450 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0232 |
2019-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0232 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |