DC B23-0223 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0045 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5297, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act A23-0045 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5297, Expires on Jul 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Order Nos. 3 through 5 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0005 with Fort Myer Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Change Order Nos. 3 through 5 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0005 with Fort Myer Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Council | Act A23-0045 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 5297, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0045, Expires on Jul 14, 2019 |
2019-04-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |