DC B23-0178 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it creates an Interagency Council on Behavioral Health and describes its members, powers, and duties.
Title
Interagency Council on Behavioral Health Establishment Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0178 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-03-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0178 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42007/Introduction/B23-0178-Introduction.pdf |