DC B23-0166 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Law Number L23-0114 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 23-114 adds the Arland D. Williams Jr. Memorial Bridge, the Harry W. Nice Bridge, Sandy Hook Bridge, Brunswick Bridge, and Point of Rocks Bridge to the list of bridges covered by the Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24CouncilLaw Number L23-0114 Effective from Jun 24, 2020
2020-05-15CouncilAct A23-0306 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5075
2020-05-12CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-05-05CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-04-27CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0306
2020-04-17CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020
2020-04-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-03-03CouncilFirst Reading
2020-03-03CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2020-02-20CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-02-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0166
2020-01-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-12-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0166 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-02-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback