DC B23-0165 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0570 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001073
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0570 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001073
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Board of Elections to solicit an opinion from the Attorney General for the District of Columbia and the General Counsel of the Council of the District of Columbia on the proper subject determination of an initiative or referendum measure and to also consult regarding the legislative drafting of the measure. It requires that initiative measures be placed on a general election ballot.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Initiative and Referendum Process Improvement Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (R. White & K. McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0570 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001073 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0570 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (R. White & K. McDuffie) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0165 |
2019-06-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0165 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |