DC B23-0139 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it approves the disposition of land located at 545 7th Street, SE, known as the B.B. French School Building to the Capitol Hill Arts Workshop for a property lease term of 20 years.
Title
Capitol Hill Arts Workshop Lease Renewal Authorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0139 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Procurement |
2019-02-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0139 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41879/Introduction/B23-0139-Introduction.pdf |