DC B23-0121 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it revises the qualifications for nominees to the Housing Authority Board of Commissioners by requiring certain expertise in housing including: experience in public housing, subsidized housing, social services, or real estate finance and investment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Authority Board Of Commissioners Qualifications And Expansion Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0121 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-02-05CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback