DC B23-0075 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0024, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12639
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0024, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12639
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-24 exempts 2714 Georgia Avenue, N.W. from taxation and to provide equitable tax relief.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Mypheduh Films DBA Sankofa Video and Books Real Property Tax Exemption Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0024, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12639 |
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0107 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9759 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0107 |
2019-07-16 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 30, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | First Reading |
2019-06-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-06-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0075 |
2019-06-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0075 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |