DC B23-0041 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes the Office of the Taxpayer Advocate as an independent agency. The agency mission is to assist taxpayers in resolving complex tax problems with the District that have not been resolved through normal channels.
Title
Taxpayer Advocate Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-02-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0041 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0041 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41632/Introduction/B23-0041-Introduction.pdf |