DC B22-0947 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill makes the Office of the State Superintendent of Education (OSSE) subordinate to the State Board of Education. It requires OSSE to verify data produced by the District of Columbia Public Schools and to investigate any inaccuracies.
Title
Office Of The State Superintendent Of Education Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0947 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0947 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40925/B22-0947-Introduction.pdf |