DC B22-0918 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0639 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2030
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0639 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2030
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides an abatement of real property taxes on real property leased by EAB Gobal Inc. in an amount not to exceed $2 million per tax year during the abatement period.
Title
Local Jobs And Tax Incentive Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Evans) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Evans) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Council | Act A22-0639 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2030 |
2019-02-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0639 |
2019-02-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0639 |
2019-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Evans) |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0918 |
2018-11-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0918 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |