DC B22-0917 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 208
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill renews the cable franchise agreement between the Government of the District of Columbia and Comcast of the District, LLC for ten years.
Title
Approval Of The Comcast Of The District, Llc Cable Television System Franchise Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 208 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0543 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0543 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0917 |
2018-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0917 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |