DC B22-0887 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0638 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2028
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill provides equitable real property tax relief to real property owned by Hyacinth's Place located on Lots 0161 and 0124, Square 4074. FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hyacinth's Place Equitable Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15CouncilAct A22-0638 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2028
2019-02-06CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0638
2019-02-06CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0638
2019-01-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2019
2018-12-18CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-12-04CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-11-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-28CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0887
2018-11-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-11-02CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-07-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0887 Published in the DC Register
2018-07-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2018-07-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback