DC B22-0799 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Act A22-0358, Expires on August 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5777
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Act A22-0358, Expires on August 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5777
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To Contract No. Dcka-2013-c-0029 With Fort Myer Construction Corporation Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Dcka-2013-c-0029 With Fort Myer Construction Corporation Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Council | Act A22-0358, Expires on August 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5777 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0358 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0358 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-05-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |