DC B22-0777 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill promotes priority in applications and interviews for entry-level job positions to District public and public charter high school graduates. It also establishes an apprenticeship program in District government employment. The Department of Human Resources is required to develop partnerships to foster applications and hiring.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Pathways To District Government Careers Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-16 | Council | Act A22-0512 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12603 |
2018-11-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0512 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 6, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0777 |
2018-06-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0777 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |