DC B22-0771 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Act A22-0333, Expires on July 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Act A22-0333, Expires on July 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of 8th & O Streets, N.w. Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of 8th & O Streets, N.w. Congressional Review Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Council | Act A22-0333, Expires on July 31, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5056 |
2018-05-03 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0333 |
2018-05-03 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0333 |
2018-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |