DC B22-0747 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill designates the alley in Square 983 that runs east and west between the 600 blocks of 11th and 12th Streets, N.E., and the 1100 blocks of G and F Streets, N.E., in Ward 6, as "Bruce Robey Way."
Title
Bruce Robey Way Designation Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-23 | Council | Act A22-0518 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12975 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0518 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0518 |
2018-10-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 13, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0747 |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0747 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |