DC B22-0640 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill clarifies that the Rental Housing Commission is an independent agency within the executive branch of the District government. Among other things, it provides for the composition and duties of the Commission, and specifies that the Commission is comprised of 3 members appointed by the Mayor for a 3-year term, subject to removal for good cause only.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Rental Housing Commission Independence Clarification Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-02 | Council | Act A22-0492 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12066 |
2018-10-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0492 |
2018-10-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 25, 2018 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Bonds) |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-07-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0640 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-05-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0640 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-12-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |