DC B22-0609 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0134 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0134 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill allows for the disposition of two pieces of real property known as portions of Lots 809, 810, and 814 in Square 744S which correspond with the disposition and development of 125 O Street, S.E. and 1402 1st Street, S.E.
Title
Parcel F1 Easement Disposition Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0134 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Council | Act A22-0353 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5767 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0353 |
2018-05-15 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0353 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-04-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0609 |
2018-03-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-03-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0609 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |