DC B22-0597 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires all health benefit plans offered by an insurance carrier to meet the requirements of the federal Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenci Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. It requires all plans to submit an annual report to the Department of Health Care Finance on or before October 1 of every calendar year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Parity Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
2019-01-25CouncilAct A22-0568 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 930
2019-01-16CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0568
2019-01-16CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0568
2018-12-31CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019
2018-12-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-11-13CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-10-19CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-10-04CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0597
2017-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0597 Published in the DC Register
2017-11-21CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-11-21CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback