DC B22-0572 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0633 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Act A22-0633 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes limits on the amount that can be garnished from an individual's wages by factoring in gross wages and disposable wages. It prevents wage garnishment from individuals making less than a living wage and requires notice be provided to those whose wages will be garnished.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Wage Garnishment Fairness Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Motion to Postpone to 12/18/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Motion to Postpone to 12/18/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Council | Act A22-0633 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2008 |
2019-02-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0633 |
2019-02-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0633 |
2019-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Motion to Postpone to 12/18/18 Legislative Meeting |
2018-11-20 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0572 |
2018-06-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-05-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0572 Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |