DC B22-0537 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0165 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0165 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-165 makes amendments to the law regulating the sale, transportation, and consumption of alcoholic beverages. It establishes when wine and distillery pub permit holders can transport their products between locations. It clarifies the tasting hours for several license categories. It creates an exception to the 400-foot rule for on premises and off premise retailer licenses in the Southwest Waterfront or on the campus of a college or university respectively. Lastly, it allows holders of bed and breakfast licenses to obtain endorsements for sidewalk cafés and summer gardens.
Title
Omnibus Alcoholic Beverage Regulation Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0165 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-14 | Council | Act A22-0439 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9366 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0439 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0439 |
2018-08-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 5, 2018 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie) |
2018-06-26 | Council | First Reading |
2018-06-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-06-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0537 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-01-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2017-11-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0537 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |