DC B22-0528 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill authorizes the Department of General Services to enter into a lease agreement with the DC Bilingual Public Charter School for real property located at 33-35 Riggs Road, NE, Washington, DC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keene School Disposition And Lease Approval Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0528 Published in the DC Register
2017-10-16CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback