DC B22-0525 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill reduces the total cost of a basic business license, and all required endorsements, taxes, and fees, for new businesses with taxable incomes of $100,000 or less to 25% of the total cost of the basic business license fee.
Title
Micro-business Startup Fee Relief Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0525 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0525 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39029/B22-0525-Introduction.pdf |