DC B22-0508 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0191 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0191 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-191 establishes an Office of Nightlife within the Executive Office of the Mayor to coordinate and manage the District's after-hours economy, primarily between the hours of 5pm and 5am. It will serve as a point of contact for nightlife establishments and the intermediary between establishments and DC government agencies. This bill also establishes a Commission of Nightlife to advise the Mayor.
Title
Office And Commission Of Nightlife Establishment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0191 Effective from December 13, 2018 |
2018-10-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2018-10-26 | Council | Act A22-0473 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 11868 |
2018-10-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0473 |
2018-10-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0473 |
2018-10-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 24, 2018 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-09-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0508 |
2018-06-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0508 |
2017-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0508 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-10-03 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |