DC B22-0485 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Law Number L22-0040 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Law Number L22-0040 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics Board Quorum Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Ethics Board Quorum Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Council | Law Number L22-0040 Effective from January 17, 2018, Expires on August 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018 |
2017-12-01 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is January 12, 2018 |
2017-12-01 | Council | Act A22-0186 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12304 |
2017-11-22 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0186 |
2017-11-22 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0186 |
2017-11-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0485 Published in the DC Register |
2017-10-03 | Council | First Reading |
2017-10-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |