DC B22-0448 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a new rental subsidy program for seniors and tenants with disabilities and specifies that the maximum amount that may be disbursed per recipient is $500 per month.
Title
Senior Tenants And Residents With Disabilities Rental Assistance Program Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0448 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0448 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38763/B22-0448-Introduction.pdf |