DC B22-0442 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires housing providers to file registration statements for each housing accommodation for which they are receiving or entitled to receive rent with the Rent Administrator, and specifies that the registration statement must be available for public inspection online on the web portal of the Department of Housing and Community Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental Housing Registration Update Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0442 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback