DC B22-0324 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - First Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill updates the District's notary laws to conform with current best practices. It does not require the notary's sole place of residence or business be in the District. It gives the Mayor the authority to revoke the commission of notary publics who take higher fees than what is permitted by law. Among other things it requires that upon death, resignation, or revocation, notaries must return the official notarial seal to the District, along with other official documents and establishes an electronic notary system. Renamed by committee to "Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts Act of 2018". Incorporates provisions from Bill 22-467.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notary Public Electronic Establishment And Enhancement Amendment Act Of 2017 (aka "revised Uniform Law On Notarial Acts Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-07-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-06-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0324
2017-12-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-06-16CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0324 Published in the DC Register
2017-06-06CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2017-06-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback