DC B22-0295 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0056 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0056 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-56 finds that a portion of the public alley bounded by New York Avenue to the North, Brentwood Parkway to the East, Penn Street to the South and 4th Street to the west, is unnecessary for alley purposes and orders it closed. The portion of the alley to be closed is located in Ward 5.
Title
Closing Of A Portion Of A Public Alley In Square 3594, S.o. 16-25309, Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Council | Law Number L22-0056 Effective from February 15, 2018, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2018-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 10, 2018 |
2017-12-29 | Council | Act A22-0215 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13436 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0215 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0215 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 26, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-07 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-10-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0295 |
2017-09-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-06-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0295 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |